HI HB552 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB552
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends penalties for violations of laws and administrative rules governing boating and ocean recreation by aligning penalties with the severity of the prohibited conduct. Clarifies that imposition of civil or criminal penalties does not preclude the imposition of administrative fines. (HB552 HD2)
Title
Relating To Chapter 200, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 749) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:01PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) McKelvey voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 191) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 02-06-19 9:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to WLH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB552 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).