HI HB552 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Act 043, 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the Affordable Health Insurance Working Group to plan for and mitigate adverse effects of the potential repeal of the federal Affordable Care Act by Congress. (HB552 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health Insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22SenateAct 043, 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143).
2017-06-22HouseAct 043, on 06/20/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143).
2017-05-03HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2017-05-04SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
2017-05-03HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
2017-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2017-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
2017-04-28SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 130).
2017-04-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
2017-04-28HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 130) as amended in (CD 1).
2017-04-27SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani.
2017-04-27HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takumi, Luke, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-26SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 10:00AM in conference room 016.
2017-04-25SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 1:00PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 1:00PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-21SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 1:00PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-20HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 2:00PM in conference room 016.
2017-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; Kidani.
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
2017-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Takumi, Luke Co-Chairs; Tupola.
2017-04-13HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2017-04-11HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 584) in amended form (SD 2).
2017-04-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Riviere). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-04-07Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17.
2017-04-07SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1592) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2017-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere.
2017-03-31SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-17 1:35PM in conference room 211.
2017-03-24SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2017-03-24SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1161) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2017-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
2017-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 03-22-17 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2017-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to CPH, WAM.
2017-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 111).
2017-03-03HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-03-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 845), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2017-02-23HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
2017-02-21HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-17 12:00PM in House conference room 308.
2017-02-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
2017-02-17HouseReported from HLT/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 523) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2017-02-13HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2017-02-13HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Tupola.
2017-02-08HouseBill scheduled for decision-making on Monday, 02-13-17 2:15PM in House conference room 329.
2017-02-08HouseThe committee(s) on HLT/CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-17 at 2:15PM.
2017-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT/CPC on Wednesday, 02-08-17 2:05PM in House conference room 329.
2017-01-30HouseRe-referred to HLT/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 7
2017-01-25HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3
2017-01-23HousePass First Reading
2017-01-20HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB403 (Same As) 2017-03-09 - Referred to HLT/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback