HI HB552 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-20 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds three voting members to the University of Hawaii Board of Regents to represent undergraduate students, research faculty, and other faculty. Converts existing student member to represent graduate students.
Title
University of Hawaii Board of Regents
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1). |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 481), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-02-10 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Kong, LoPresti, Ohno, Say, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Takumi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2015-02-09 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2015-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-10-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-30 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-05-15 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2015-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 02-05-15 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2015-01-28 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB636 (Same As) 2015-01-26 - Referred to HEA, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=552&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HB552_.HTM |