HI HB552 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-28 - (H) Re-referred to WLO/JUD, referral sheet 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-01-28 - (H) Re-referred to WLO/JUD, referral sheet 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires authors and publishers of travel websites or guide book publications encouraging or inviting readers to trespass onto private property or through private property to access an attraction to be held liable for injuries sustained by the reader on the private property.
Title
Visitor Guide Liability; Publication Liability
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-28 | (H) Re-referred to WLO/JUD, referral sheet 3 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to TOU/WLO, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1208 (Same As) 2011-01-26 - (S) Referred to EDT, JDL.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=552 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HB552_.HTM |