HI HB549 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires new developments to plan for the impacts of projected sea level rise and prohibits development in areas significantly affected by projected sea level rise. Amends policies and objectives related to coastal zone management to reduce residential exposure to coastal hazards and protect state beaches and public shoreline access. Defines "beach" and "coastal hazards". (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Environment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
2019-03-20SenateReported from AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1265) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 3:00PM in conference room 224.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to AEN/WTL, JDC/WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 195).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1057), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-22HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 545), recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-14HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say.
2019-02-13HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-13HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-13-19 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
2019-02-08HouseReported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 219) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2019-02-05HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-05-19 8:45AM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-28HouseRe-referred to EEP, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
2019-01-22HouseReferred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 4
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback