HI HB546 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB546
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes counties to levy a county surcharge on transient accommodations tax to fund workforce housing development in their respective counties. Establishes a workforce housing development trust fund.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to HSG, TOU, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB546 (Carry Over) 2017-02-07 - The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=546&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB546_.HTM |