HI HB544 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB544
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of general obligation bonds and appropriates funds, to be expended by the University of Hawaii, for a capital improvement project to remove the Hoku Kea telescope from the summit of Mauna Kea. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Making An Appropriation For A Capital Improvement Project At Mauna Kea On The Island Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 81) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-04-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB544 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).