HI HB543 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 098, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1199).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 098, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1199).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Hawaii Housing Finance and Development Corporation to initiate negotiations and exercise its power of eminent domain to acquire the Front Street Apartments affordable housing project on Maui unless the ground lease is renegotiated, or a new lease is issued by 12/31/19. Extends the deadline to complete the Lealii affordable housing project on Maui. Appropriates funds from the rental housing revolving fund. (HB543 CD1)
Title
Relating To Affordable Housing.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] |
Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | Senate | Act 098, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1199). |
2019-06-12 | House | Act 098, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1199). |
2019-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 144). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 144) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, K. Rhoads, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, C. Lee, Cullen, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 1:05PM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 1:05PM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 919). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: S. Chang Chair; K. Rhoads, English Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Brower, C. Lee, Cullen Co-Chairs; Yamashita, McDermott. |
2019-04-15 | House | Re-referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 52 |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 753) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1961) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1441) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HOU, JDC/WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 193). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1084), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-19 | House | Re-referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 23 |
2019-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3). |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 164) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1331 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to HOU/JDC, WAM.
Subjects
Acquisition
Affordable Housing
Appropriation ($)
Front Street Apartments
HHFDC
Lealii Affordable Housing Project
Report
Affordable Housing
Appropriation ($)
Front Street Apartments
HHFDC
Lealii Affordable Housing Project
Report