HI HB540 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB540
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows greater flexibility in conditions placed on eligibility requirements for the motion picture, digital media, and film production income tax credit. Amends the amount of the total tax credit that may be claimed per qualified production. Amends the annual aggregate cap placed on the amount of the tax credits that may be claimed by qualified productions.
Title
Relating To Film And Digital Media Industry Development.
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:10AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB540 (Carry Over) 2019-02-08 - The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=540&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB540_.HTM |