HI HB534 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB534
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to HOU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to HOU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys for Hawaii Public Housing Authority to hire an additional security guard to improve security and monitoring at the Alu Street gate of Kalihi Valley Homes public housing. (HB534 HD2)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Public Housing Authority.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 270). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1018) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Tupola. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 321) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2017-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-07-17 11:15AM in conference room 423. |
2017-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 01-31-17 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB534 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to HOU, WAM.