HI HB529 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

For criminal cases resulting in no conviction: 1) prohibits commercial websites from collecting a fee for removing arrest booking photographs from the website; and 2) prohibits criminal justice agencies from posting arrest booking photographs on a website except as provided by law. (HB529 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crime; Arrest Booking Photographs; Mug Shots; Commercial Websites

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-12-17 Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
2015-02-20HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
2015-02-20HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 549) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
2015-02-11HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Creagan, Har, Kawakami, C. Lee, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Brower, Hashem, Nakashima.
2015-02-09HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-11-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2015-02-09HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-15.
2015-02-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-09-15 2:30PM in House conference room 325.
2015-01-28HouseReferred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2
2015-01-26HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2015-01-23HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback