HI HB527 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB527
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 9:05AM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 9:05AM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to purchase, staff, and operate two mobile clinics to serve the homeless population. Takes effect on 7/1/2075. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Mobile Clinics.
Sponsors
Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-25-17 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-24-17 11:05AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 9:15AM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Ihara, Galuteria Co-Chairs; S. Chang. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Morikawa, Belatti, Gates Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 581) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from CPH/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1483) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Wakai. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH/WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1111) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH/WAM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Wakai. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-22-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 2:50PM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HMS, CPH/WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 108). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 951), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Lowen, Tupola. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from HUS/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 268) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Har, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Har, Kobayashi, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Wednesday, 02-08-17 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB527 (Carry Over) 2017-04-27 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 9:05AM in conference room 229.
SB437 (Same As) 2017-01-23 - Referred to JDL.
SB347 (Same As) 2017-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
SB437 (Same As) 2017-01-23 - Referred to JDL.
SB347 (Same As) 2017-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).