HI HB527 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a blue ribbon task force in the department of budget and finance to explore the feasibility of having the employees' retirement system purchase Ala Moana Center and the Ward Centers.
Title
Employees' Retirement System; Task Force
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-01-30 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be HELD. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Awana, Hanohano, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Saiki, Takumi, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Souki. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 01-30-09 8:30am in House conference room 309. | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Referred to LAB, EBM, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2009-01-26 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=527&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HB527_.HTM |