HI HB523 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB523
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes a $20 per guest tax on users of transient accommodations for the purposes of funding conservation efforts.
Title
Relating To Protection Of Natural Resources.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] |
Rep. David Tarnas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP/LAT, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB718 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB523 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EEP/LAT, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB523 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EEP/LAT, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Condominium
Conservation
Hotel
Special Land and Development Fund
Tourism
Transient Accommodations Tax
Visitors
Conservation
Hotel
Special Land and Development Fund
Tourism
Transient Accommodations Tax
Visitors
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=523&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB523_.HTM |