HI HB523 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 217, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1331).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows DAGS to establish a recycling pilot program to reasonably provide and maintain onsite collection methods at buildings and facilities it manages, maintains, or services for the collection of recyclable materials. Appropriates funds. (HB523 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Recycling.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-13SenateBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 217, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1331).
2017-07-13HouseBecame law without the Governor's signature, Act 217, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1331).
2017-06-23SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 06-23-17 (Gov. Msg. No. 1161)
2017-06-23HouseNotice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1161)
2017-05-03HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2017-05-04SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
2017-05-03HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
2017-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2017-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
2017-04-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
2017-04-28SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 120).
2017-04-28HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
2017-04-28HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 120) as amended in (CD 1).
2017-04-27SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-27HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Kong; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola.
2017-04-27HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 1:00PM in conference room 309.
2017-04-24HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 1:00PM in conference room 309.
2017-04-21HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-24-17 1:00PM in conference room 309.
2017-04-19HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 1:00PM in conference room 309.
2017-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Kim, Riviere Co-Chairs.
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
2017-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: LoPresti Chair; Kong, Tupola.
2017-04-13HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2017-04-11HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 580) in amended form (SD 1).
2017-04-11SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-04-07SenateOne Day Notice 04-11-17.
2017-04-07SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1588) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2017-03-30SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele.
2017-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 1:40PM in conference room 211.
2017-03-24SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2017-03-24SenateReported from AEN/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1068) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2017-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Ruderman, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Tokuda.
2017-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
2017-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on AEN/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-17 1:15PM in conference room 224.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to AEN/GVO, WAM.
2017-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 107).
2017-03-03HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-03-02HousePassed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
2017-03-02HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 827), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2017-02-09HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-02-06HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-09-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2017-01-25HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 3
2017-01-23HousePass First Reading
2017-01-20HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback