HI HB519 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB519

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes cash payments made by developers in lieu of providing the required reserved housing units in the development of residential projects for the Hawaii community development authority to be deposited into the rental housing revolving fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Affordable Housing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB865 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB519 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback