HI HB518 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the state rent supplement program for homeless individuals or families who work, either part-time or full-time, and who are ready to rent permanent housing in order to obtain and maintain permanent housing and the hiring of one program specialist to monitor the program. Effective 07/01/2030. (SD2)
Title
Housing; Homeless; State Rent Supplement Program; Appropriation; Program Specialist ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Jo Jordan [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 41). |
2014-02-18 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 3:30PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-23-13 3:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 3:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Espero replaced Senator(s) Ige as (Co-) Chair(s). |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 3:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Green, Ruderman, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Cabanilla, Carroll, Woodson Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Ward. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 499) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Deferred until 04-09-13. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-05-13. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1255) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele, L. Thielen. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 886) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Slom. |
2013-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-11-13 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-09-13 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HMS, WAM. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 35). |
2013-02-19 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-15 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 02-19-13. |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 593) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-14 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, Woodson. |
2013-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-14-13 3:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Say excused (2). |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported from HSG/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 119) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-01-28 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Belatti, Cabanilla, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. |
2013-01-28 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Woodson, Belatti, Jordan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/HUS on Monday, 01-28-13 11:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to HSG/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |