HI HB517 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB517

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that the state auditor may examine all accounts and records of any other State department, agency, or division notwithstanding any law to the contrary. Effective 7/1/2114. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Auditor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-08 - House - House Legislative Management: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-02-11HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
2021-02-11HouseReported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 150) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-08HouseThe committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Belatti, Morikawa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to LMG, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB517 (Carry Over) 2021-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback