HI HB515 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1282).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1282).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Part I - Requires the auditor to audit the department of education's school food services branch to determine the amount of local produce that is being purchased and served to students. Part II - Requires that the board of education prioritize for the superintendent of education position candidates that have the minimum qualification of ten years of employment in a department of education including no less than five years serving as a principal or in a higher-level position, and a desired qualification for a candidate is having a working understanding of the State's tri-level system of educational administration. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | House | Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1282). |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Vetoed on 07/06/2021 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1282). |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Notice of Intent to veto dated 06/21/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2021-06-21 | House | Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1158) |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 635). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with Representative(s) Kapela, LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-04-27 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2021-04-23 | House | Deferred one day 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 625). |
2021-04-22 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-15-21. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 619). |
2021-04-22 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Hashem, Cullen Co-Chairs; Okimoto. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 685) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1699) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-04-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-09-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from EDU/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1118) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Chang, Gabbard, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-21 3:10PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to EDU/GVO, WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to EDU/AEN/GVO, WAM. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 60). |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 681), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 551), recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-17 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-17-21 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on AGR with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 158) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to AGR. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2021-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-04-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EDN, AGR, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |