HI HB513 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 231, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1359).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 231, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1359).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Dissolves the state capitol management committee.
Title
Relating To The State Capitol Management Committee.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Legislative Management: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - House - House Legislative Management: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Act 231, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1359). |
2021-07-07 | House | Act 231, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1359). |
2021-04-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 637). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Kim. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Taniguchi). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1688) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Shimabukuro. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-06-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1106) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to GVO, WAM/JDC. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Dela Cruz, Chang, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-16-21 3:00PM; CR 016 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to GVO, JDC. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 58). |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 685), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 149), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-08 | House | The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Belatti, Morikawa, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LMG on Monday, 02-08-21 2:00PM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |