HI HB510 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB510
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-22 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 893).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-22 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 893).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes the state earned income tax credit refundable and extends the availability of the tax credit for an additional 6 years. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Misalucha, Moriwaki, Fevella. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 744) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Ihara. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3892) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-07-22 10:40AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference (Proposed Draft). |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 124). |
2021-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 814), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, McDermott. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 1:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 270) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-12 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-12-21 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-02 | House | Re-referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB510 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to WAM.