HI HB508 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Act 050, on 06/22/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1150).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-23 - Act 050, on 06/22/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1150).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the maximum administrative fines for ethics violations. Clarifies the assessment of fines in the context of a settlement agreement. (HB508 CD1)
Title
Relating To Ethics.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-23 | House | Act 050, on 06/22/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1150). |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Act 050, 06/22/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1150). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 148). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 148) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2017-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Cullen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-17 10:00AM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Gabbard, Kim. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto, Cullen Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 545). |
2017-04-07 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 492) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-17. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1293) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 104). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 935), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Tupola. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 531) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa. |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-09-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |