HI HB500 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB500
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Executive Office on Early Learning and State Public Charter School Commission to enter into a memorandum of understanding to administer charter school prekindergarten classrooms. Appropriates moneys to continue funding of public prekindergarten classrooms. Effective 7/1/2051. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Public Prekindergarten Programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2018-03-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting rescheduled for 04-28-17 11:30AM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 3:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 2:45PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Shimabukuro Co-Chair; K. Kahele. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Cullen Co-Chairs; Takumi, Matsumoto. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 577) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1513) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Inouye, Taniguchi, Wakai. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-17 1:40PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1059) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Espero, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-17 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 102). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 936), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Lowen, Tupola. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 717) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-15 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Har, Creagan, Hashem, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2017-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-17. |
2017-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-08-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1152 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB500 (Carry Over) 2017-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
HB500 (Carry Over) 2017-04-28 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
Subjects
Appropriations ($)
Charter Schools
Executive Office on Early Learning
Hawaii State Public Charter School Commission
Public Prekindergarten Program
Charter Schools
Executive Office on Early Learning
Hawaii State Public Charter School Commission
Public Prekindergarten Program