HI HB499 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-05 - Act 185, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Corrects the labeling dimensions for a label affixed to display fireworks from nine inches by nine inches to nine square inches. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Fireworks Labeling.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-05SenateAct 185, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287).
2019-07-05HouseAct 185, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1287).
2019-04-24HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-04-25SenateReceived notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 859).
2019-04-24HousePassed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1).
2019-04-24HouseHouse agrees to Senate amendment(s).
2019-04-24SenateReceived notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 855).
2019-04-23HouseReconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19.
2019-04-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 950).
2019-04-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 746) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-04SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1862) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang, Fevella.
2019-03-22SenateThe committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPH.
2019-03-22SenateReported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1411) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPH.
2019-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Baker; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:20PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to PSM, CPH.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 386).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1).
2019-02-28HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 930) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-05HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino.
2019-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to CPC, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB152 (Same As) 2019-03-12 - Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 31

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback