HI HB499 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-05 - Referred to HRE/AGL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-05 - Referred to HRE/AGL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the establishment of a research program on the stewardship of aquaculture and marine protected areas at the Hawaii Institute of Marine Biology. Appropriates funds on a matching basis with federal funds. Effective July 1, 2013. (HB499 HD1)
Title
Hawaii Institute of Marine Biology; Marine Protected Areas ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HRE/AGL, WAM. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 94). |
2013-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 661), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2013-02-13 | House | Re-referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 23 |
2013-02-05 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4). |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported from OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 60) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2013-02-01 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Evans, Kawakami, C. Lee, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman. |
2013-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH on Friday, 02-01-13 8:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to OMH, HED, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |