HI HB496 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB496
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Labor & Public Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the State Fire Council to employ additional staff, contract with any county fire department to fulfill staff positions, and purchase office equipment and supplies. Repeals the requirement that the State Fire Council administrator be employed on a full-time basis.
Title
Relating To The State Fire Council.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:20AM in House conference room 309. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB149 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB496 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB496 (Carry Over) 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=496&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB496_.HTM |