HI HB490 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB490
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-25 - Referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides employed individuals with up to 8 weeks of paid family leave during the 1st year after birth of the individual's child, adoption of a child by the individual, or placement of a child with the individual through foster care, and 8 weeks of paid family leave to care for the individual's family member having a serious health condition during any benefit year, paid through an employer-based private insurance program currently used to provide for temporary disability benefits. Specifies that private employers having fewer than 200 employees shall not be required to provide family leave and family leave benefits. Repeals chapter 398, HRS. Appropriates funds to the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations. Sections 1-28 effective 7/1/2025.
Title
Relating To Family Leave.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB490 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to LGO, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
DLIR
Employer Based Insurance Program
Insurance Benefits
Paid Family Leave
Temporary Disability Insurance
DLIR
Employer Based Insurance Program
Insurance Benefits
Paid Family Leave
Temporary Disability Insurance
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=490&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HB490_.HTM |