HI HB489 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB489
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the thirty-day lapse or termination notices for long-term care policies to be sent by certified mail, priority mail, or commercial delivery service, or other method of delivery requiring proof of delivery.
Title
Relating To Long-term Care Insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-05-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB836 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB489 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB489 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=489&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB489_.HTM |