HI HB489 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the offense of strangulation of a family or household member to include blocking the nose or mouth of the person or applying excessive pressure to the chest. Clarifies that infliction of visible injury is not required to establish the offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Domestic Violence.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-11HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1037 (Same As) 2019-07-05 - Act 175, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1277).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback