HI HB488 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB488
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that certain provisions of the Internal Revenue Code related to at-risk rules and deductions and to passive activity losses do not apply with respect to claims from the state low-income housing tax credit. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | The conference committee deferred the measure. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 5:10PM in conference room 309. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 4:00PM in conference room 309. |
2017-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 1:35PM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 1:35PM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 1:40PM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-25-17 1:40PM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 1:45PM in conference room 229. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Green, Harimoto Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Brower, Nakamura Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 575) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1505) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-17 1:35PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HOU/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1109) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, S. Chang, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Wakai. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 03-21-17 2:50PM in conference room 225. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS deferred the measure until 03-22-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 2:45PM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HOU/HMS, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 266). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1015) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Lowen, Tupola. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 320) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB488 (Carry Over) 2017-04-28 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
SB1142 (Same As) 2017-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
SB1142 (Same As) 2017-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.