HI HB487 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-03 - Re-referred to HHH, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes advanced practice registered nurses, in addition to physicians, to practice medical aid in dying in accordance with their scope of practice and prescribing authority. Authorizes psychiatric mental health nurse practitioners, in addition to psychiatrists, psychologists, and clinical social workers, to provide counseling to a qualified patient. Reduces the mandatory waiting period between oral requests from twenty days to fifteen days. Waives the mandatory waiting period for those terminally ill individuals not expected to survive the mandatory waiting period.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-03HouseRe-referred to HHH, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 5
2021-01-27HouseReferred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB839 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 3 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback