HI HB487 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 5:45PM in Conference Room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Expands livestock feed subsidy to include feed for goats, sheep, lambs, fish, and crustaceans. Creates a subsidy for qualified feed developers. Appropriates funds. Authorizes the DOA to dispose of lands to and negotiate and enter into leases with the ADC. Exempts non-agricultural park lands disposed of to the ADC from section 166E-8(b)(2) and (5), HRS. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Livestock Feed Subsidy; Livestock Feed Developer Subsidy; Appropriation; Department of Agriculture; Disposition of Lands; Agribusiness Development Corporation ($)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-26HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 5:45PM in Conference Room 224.
2013-04-26HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 5:10PM in Conference Room 224.
2013-04-26HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 224.
2013-04-26HouseReceived notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 750).
2013-04-26SenateSenator(s) Dela Cruz added as conferee(s).
2013-04-26HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 3:30 PM in Conference Room 224.
2013-04-24HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-26-13 10:30AM in conference room 224.
2013-04-24HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 738).
2013-04-24SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Nishihara, Chair; Kouchi, Co-Chair(s); Ige.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Wooley, Onishi Co-Chairs; Ohno, Cheape.
2013-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
2013-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2013-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 497) in amended form (SD 2).
2013-04-09SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
2013-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1398) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2013-03-27SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ruderman, L. Thielen ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
2013-03-25SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-27-13 9:00AM in conference room 211.
2013-03-21SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-13 9:10AM in conference room 211.
2013-03-21SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2013-03-21SenateReported from AGL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 971) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2013-03-19SenateThe committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Slom.
2013-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on AGL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2013-03-07SenateReferred to AGL, WAM.
2013-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 226).
2013-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
2013-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 899) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2013-02-28HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2013-02-28HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-28-13 2:30PM in conference room 308.
2013-02-25HouseThe committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2013-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2013-02-06HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Say excused (2).
2013-02-06HouseReported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 126) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2013-01-31HouseThe committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Choy, Ohno, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Cheape, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola.
2013-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 01-31-13 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
2013-01-22HouseReferred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 3
2013-01-22HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-18HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback