HI HB486 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Specifies that a government agency does not assume ownership or jurisdiction over a disputed road through any maintenance or repair activities. Authorizes the State to transfer ownership of roads in favor of counties by quitclaim if requested by the county. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
2021-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-18HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
2021-02-18HouseReported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 430), recommending referral to JHA.
2021-02-16HouseThe committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno.
2021-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-16-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-09HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-02-09HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 78) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
2021-02-05HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-02HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to TRN, WAL, JHA, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB648 (Same As) 2021-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback