HI HB486 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 3:15PM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits persons convicted of certain prostitution offenses to file a motion to vacate the conviction if the defendant is not convicted of another offense under the Penal Code within three years of the prostitution offense. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Prostitution.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 3:15PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-23HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 3:30PM in conference room 325.
2019-04-22HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 948).
2019-04-22SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Kim, Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; Ichiyama, Wildberger, Thielen.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 744) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-04Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-04-04SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1884) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-11SenateThe committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 9:30AM in conference room 016.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to JDC.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 382).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1).
2019-02-28HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 952) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-22HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Creagan, McKelvey.
2019-02-19HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-22-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-19HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-22-19.
2019-02-13HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-19-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-13HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 02-19-19.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2019-02-11HouseThe committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1039 (Same As) 2019-07-05 - Act 176, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1278).
SB219 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 2:30PM in conference room 224.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback