HI HB485 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-25 - The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, McDermott.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the amount of the rental motor vehicle surcharge tax from $5 to an unspecified amount. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, McDermott.
2021-02-23HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 1:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-19HouseReport adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
2021-02-19HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 627), recommending referral to FIN.
2021-02-17HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har.
2021-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-12HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Eli, Gates, Hashimoto excused (3).
2021-02-12HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 202) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2021-02-10HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Ilagan, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-10-21 10:00AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-03HouseRe-referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
2021-01-27HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback