HI HB485 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB485
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the State Commission on the Status of Women to establish a statewide training program on the state human trafficking laws for criminal justice personnel.
Title
Relating To Human Trafficking.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-19. |
2019-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB485 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB1038 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
SB771 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB1038 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
SB771 (Same As) 2019-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=485&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB485_.HTM |