HI HB484 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB484
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that clinical victim support services for victims of sexual violence and abuse are a mental health outpatient services benefit required to be covered under health insurance policies. Requires the State Auditor to conduct an impact assessment and to report any findings prior to the Regular Session of 2020. (HB484 HD2)
Title
Relating To Clinical Victim Support Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4). |
2019-02-12 | House | Deferred one day 02-13-19. |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 306) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-02-07 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-07-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4). |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 27) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2019-01-29 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 01-29-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB484 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
SB1036 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
SB1036 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).