HI HB483 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-03 - Re-referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the amount of the rental motor vehicle surcharge tax from $5 to $8 for any county with a resident population of more than 125,000, but less than 195,000. Sets aside the revenue from the increased surcharge tax for capacity projects in that county. Effective 1/1/2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-03HouseRe-referred to TRN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5
2021-01-27HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback