HI HB481 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that informational meetings and presentations on matters relating to official board business that are attended by a limited number of board members must be open to the public. Exempts members of a county council from the limitation on the number of board members that may attend an informational meeting or presentation. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Informal Meetings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-08HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2021-02-08HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 41) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-02-02HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Takumi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
2021-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-02-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB653 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback