HI HB481 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that the existing health insurance mandate for coverage of low-dose mammography includes coverage for advancing methodologies of digital mammography and breast tomosynthesis. Sunsets June 30, 2024. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1422) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-14SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen.
2019-03-11SenateRe-Referred to CPH, WAM.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to CPH/GVO, WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 52).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 813), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Todd.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-14HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
2019-02-14HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 391) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-07HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
2019-02-05HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-07-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-02-04HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Say, Thielen, Tokioka excused (4).
2019-02-04HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 26) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-01-29HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-01-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 01-29-19 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1034 (Same As) 2019-04-17 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 907).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback