HI HB478 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 119, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1220).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 119, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1220).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for full-time temporary agricultural management positions and equipment expenses for Kulani and Waiawa correctional facilities' agriculture operations. (HB478 CD1)
Title
Relating To Public Safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | House | Act 119, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1220). |
2017-07-11 | Senate | Act 119, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1220). |
2017-05-03 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 112). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 112) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele. |
2017-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, LoPresti, Onishi, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday, 04-25-17 at 1:00PM in Conference Room 312. |
2017-04-24 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-17 11:00AM in conference room 312. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Nishihara Chair; Gabbard, K. Kahele Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, LoPresti Co-Chairs; Onishi, Thielen. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 573) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1564) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee on WAM has added the measure to decision making scheduled on 04-03-17 1:35PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported from PSM/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1043) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to PSM/AEN, WAM. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 16). |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 727), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-23 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Choy. |
2017-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-23-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-02-14 | House | Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 259) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, LoPresti, Creagan, DeCoite, Gates, Ing, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 02-09-17 10:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB613 (Same As) 2017-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.