HI HB476 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB476
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes an excise tax of fifty percent of the otherwise applicable tax under section 245-3, HRS, on every wholesaler for each modified risk tobacco product sold, used, or possessed by a wholesaler. Defines modified risk tobacco product. Defines "eliquids" and "smoke" or "smoking". Amends the definition of "tobacco products". Effective 7/1/2060. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from HTH/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1172) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-21 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH/CPN, WAM. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Re-Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 314). |
2021-03-11 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-09 | House | Deferred one day 03-11-21. |
2021-03-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 903) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, McDermott. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 1:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 635) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-02-17 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kong; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Eli excused (1). |
2021-02-10 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 141) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-02-05 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Har, Kapela, LoPresti, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Friday, 02-05-21 8:30AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB476 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.