HI HB476 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB476
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits advertising of public housing units and housing subject to an owner or renter occupancy requirement under chapters 201H, 206E, and 356D, Hawaii Revised Statutes, for rental purposes and requires county police departments to enforce the prohibition. Does not apply to any state agency advertising or publicizing a housing program under chapters 201H, 206E, and 356D, Hawaii Revised Statutes, and any county agency for a housing program under chapter 201H, Hawaii Revised Statutes. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363). |
2020-06-22 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535). |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2020-06-19 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-19 at 4:40PM in Conference Room 423. |
2019-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 4:00PM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-19 1:32PM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 1:10PM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-19 1:10PM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: S. Chang Chair; Riviere Co-Chair; Kanuha, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Brower, San Buenaventura, Matayoshi Co-Chairs; Hashem, McDermott. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804). |
2019-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 741) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1975) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-19 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1443) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-19-19 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee on HOU has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 03-19-19 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU deferred the measure until 03-19-19 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-19 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 189). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1083), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from HSG/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 526) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura, Say. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashimoto, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/HSH on Tuesday, 02-12-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HSG/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB476 (Carry Over) 2019-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-19 at 4:40PM in Conference Room 423.
Subjects
Advertisement
County Police Enforcement
Housing Subject to Owner or Renter Occupancy Requirement
Prohibition
Public Housing
Vacation Rental
County Police Enforcement
Housing Subject to Owner or Renter Occupancy Requirement
Prohibition
Public Housing
Vacation Rental