HI HB47 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB47

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Excludes a homeowner-developer from the annual requirement to file a developer's report and pay a fee if the homeowner's development consists of not more than two units, in which the developer resides in one of the units and the initial sale of the other unit has been completed. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Condominiums.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-17SenateRe-Referred to CPN, WAM.
2021-03-04SenateReferred to CPN.
2021-03-04SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-03-04SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 7).
2021-02-24HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-02-24HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 658), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-02-23HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-19HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1).
2021-02-17HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 304) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2021-02-10HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2021-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-10-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-21HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-20HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB569 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB47 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Re-Referred to CPN, WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback