HI HB468 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 229, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1357).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Act 229, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1357).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Suspends the requirement for public employers to make annual required contributions to the Hawaii employer-union health benefits trust fund through fiscal year 2022-2023. Repeals on 6/30/2023. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Employer-union Health Benefits Trust Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Act 229, 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1357). |
2021-07-07 | House | Act 229, on 07/06/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1357). |
2021-04-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 634). |
2021-04-28 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 858). |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) LoPresti excused (1). |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Riviere. Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). |
2021-04-23 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 170). |
2021-04-23 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-27-21. |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 170) as amended in (CD 1). |
2021-04-21 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Dela Cruz, Chang; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-21 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Luke, D. Kobayashi, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 11:15AM in conference room CR 309. |
2021-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 842). |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Chang. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Onishi, Luke Co-Chairs; D. Kobayashi, Okimoto. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 558). |
2021-04-15 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-13 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 678) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim, Riviere. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Acasio). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported from LCA/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1567) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LCA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Chang, Keohokalole, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on LCA/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-21 10:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Re-Referred to LCA/WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to LCA, WAM. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 50). |
2021-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, D. Kobayashi, Perruso, Tam voting no (5) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 678), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tam; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Perruso; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Eli. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 12:00PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1). |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 409) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-16 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Quinlan. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 02-16-21 9:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Annual Required Contribution
Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund
Other Post-Employment Benefits
Hawaii Employer-Union Health Benefits Trust Fund
Other Post-Employment Benefits