HI HB466 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides employees with up to eight weeks of paid family leave during a one-year period paid through an employer based private insurance program currently used to provide for temporary disability benefits. Repeals chapter 398, Hawaii Revised Statutes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Family Leave And Temporary Disability Insurance.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-27HouseReferred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB679 (Same As) 2021-02-12 - The committee on LCA deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback