HI HB466 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB466
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the department of health for the aging and disability resource center. Takes effect on 1/1/2059. (SD1)
Title
Making An Appropriation For The Aging And Disability Resource Center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1305) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 48). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 823), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5). |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported from HSH/HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 680) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-14 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2019-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2019-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on HSH/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19 at 8:30 AM. |
2019-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-12-19 11:00AM in conference room 329. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on HSH/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-19 at 11:00AM. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH/HLT on Wednesday, 02-06-19 9:15AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB466 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB1024 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27
SB1024 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Referred to HSH/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27