HI HB462 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB462
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts residence or occupancy in a structure or on property directly controlled, owned, or managed by the Department of Agriculture from the Residential Landlord-Tenant Code. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Landlord Tenant Code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported from AEN/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1297) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Fevella. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN/CPH, WAM. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to AEN/CPH. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 184). |
2019-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1077), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4). |
2019-02-12 | House | Deferred one day 02-13-19. |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 308) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB462 (Carry Over) 2019-03-20 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.