HI HB461 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB461
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the coffee labeling and advertising requirements to include inner packaging or wrapping labels. Requires coffee blend labels to disclose geographic and regional origins with the percent by weight of each origin. Clarifies that the use of the term "All Hawaiian" is prohibited when the coffee product is not produced entirely from green coffee beans grown and processed in Hawaii. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Coffee Labeling.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on ECD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-02-08 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 60) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to ECD. |
2021-02-03 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-03-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR, ECD, CPC, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB461 (Carry Over) 2021-02-08 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on ECD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).