HI HB46 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB46
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-06 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all habitat conservation plans to include an agreement for plan participants to enter into and maintain an annual service contract with a stand-by and response facility available to provide emergency medical and rehabilitation services to native wildlife affected by activities undertaken within the plan area. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Wildlife.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-21 9:55AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1085) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Acasio. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-21 1:05PM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Referred to AEN/PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 179). |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Sayama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 860) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-25 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-25-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem excused (1). |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 335), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-11 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2021-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-11-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB46 (Carry Over) 2021-04-06 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
SB573 (Same As) 2021-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
SB573 (Same As) 2021-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.